FL H8059 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Honors the 200th anniversary of the signing of the Adams-Onis treaty ceding Florida to the United States and designates February 22, 2019, as "Florida Treaty Day."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adams-Onăs Treaty

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23HouseAdopted by Publication
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only
2019-04-16HouseIntroduced
2019-04-12HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback