FL H8045 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes February 25, 2018, as "St. Johns River State College Day" & commemorates the college's 60th anniversary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

St. Johns River State College Day

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-08HouseAdopted by Publication
2018-02-08HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only
2018-02-07HouseIntroduced
2018-02-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1928 (Similar To) 2018-02-21 - Adopted

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback