FL H8009 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes Major General James O. Eifert, Adjutant General of Florida, on occasion of his retirement on April 22, 2023.
Title
Major General James O. Eifert, Adjutant General of Florida
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Daley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Adopted by Publication |
2023-03-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-30 | House | Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only |
2023-03-16 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1118 (Similar To) 2023-03-29 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8009 (Adopted)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/8009 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/8009/BillText/Filed/PDF |