FL H8009 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confirms appointment of Sherrill Foltz Norman to position of Auditor General.
Title
Confirmation of Auditor General
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State | |
2015-04-23 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-21 | House | Adopted |
2015-04-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15 |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable by- Rules, Calendar and Ethics Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Rules, Calendar and Ethics Committee, 04/13/15, 5:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-04-02 | House | Introduced |
2015-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules, Calendar and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Filed |