FL H8005 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1860 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1860 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates April 28-May 5, 2019, as "Days of Remembrance" & May 2, 2019, as "Holocaust Remembrance Day" in Florida.
Title
Holocaust Remembrance Day and Week
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1860 (Adopted) |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1860 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8005 (Adopted)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/8005 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/8005/BillText/Filed/PDF |