FL H7237 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-78
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to responsibility for State University System under State Constitution; revises powers & duties of Board of Governors; provides that board has authority to regulate State University System & may adopt regulation development procedure for board & university boards of trustees to use in implementing constitutional duties & responsibilities; creates Higher Education Coordinating Council, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postsecondary Education [SPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0020 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - House Roll Call No. 0921 - Passage (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-78
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-27 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01178
2010-04-27 Withdrawn from Higher Education; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00904; Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1786 -SJ 00905; Read 2nd time -SJ 00905; Read 3rd time -SJ 00905; Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 1 -SJ 00905
2010-04-23 In Messages; Received -SJ 00801; Referred to Higher Education; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00801
2010-04-23 Read 3rd time -HJ 01023; Passed as amended; YEAS 109 NAYS 0 -HJ 01024
2010-04-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00913; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00914
2010-04-16 Filed; Introduced -HJ 00725; Referred to Calendar -HJ 00726

Same As/Similar To

S1344 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5201 (Ch. 2010-155), HB 7237 (Ch. 2010-78)
S2442 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7237 (Ch. 2010-78)
S1786 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00903; Amendment(s) adopted (611744, 369372) -SJ 00904; Substituted HB 7237 -SJ 00904; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7237 (Ch. 2010-78) -SJ 00904

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0110181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
011219Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0112191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
012081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
02820041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0282703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0282706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0287064Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1001705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1001706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100172Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100174Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004015New CodeSee Bill Text
100403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100422Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100438Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004381Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10043811Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004382Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004383Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004386Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100464Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100654Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100660Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100665Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1007264Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1007265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100924Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100926Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101190Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101310Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101328Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101330Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101347Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101374Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback