FL H7235 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certified homeless youth or minor who has had disabilities of nonage removed to obtain birth certificate; prohibits monitoring requirements that mandate pornographic materials be available in residential facilities that serve APD clients; requires court to order person involuntarily admitted to residential services to be released to agency for appropriate residential services; prohibits court from ordering that such person be released directly to residential service provider, etc.
Title
Vulnerable Children and Adults
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] | House Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee | House Health and Human Services Committee |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 836 | |
2011-04-26 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-25 | CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 6 -HJ 837 | |
2011-04-24 | PCS on Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/25/11, 11:45 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-04-08 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 600 | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
382 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 0085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 067 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1671 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 1093 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 3025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |