FL H7231 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-18 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes creation of s. 20, Art. III of State Constitution to provide standards for establishing legislative & congressional district boundaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative and Congressional District Boundaries [GPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0009 - Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0021 - Amendment (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0020 - Amendment (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0988 - Passage (Y: 74 N: 40 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0987 - Quorum (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-18 Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
2010-04-30 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01696
2010-04-30 Read 3rd time -SJ 01164; Passed; YEAS 25 NAYS 14 -SJ 01164
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Reapportionment; Ethics and Elections -SJ 00941; Substituted for CS/CS/SJR 2288 -SJ 00942; Read 2nd time -SJ 00942; Amendment(s) failed -SJ 00942
2010-04-26 In Messages; Received -SJ 00880; Referred to Reapportionment; Ethics and Elections -SJ 00880
2010-04-26 Read 3rd time -HJ 01054; Passed as amended; YEAS 74 NAYS 40 -HJ 01081
2010-04-23 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00938; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00938
2010-04-19 Favorable by- Rules and Calendar Council; YEAS 12 NAYS 6 -HJ 00763; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00763
2010-04-16 Filed; Introduced -HJ 00725; Referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00725; On Council agenda-- Rules and Calendar Council, 04/19/10, 6:15 pm or 15 minutes upon adjournment of Session, 404-H

Same As/Similar To

S2288 (Same As) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00941; Amendment(s) adopted (476040) -SJ 00941; Substituted HJR 7231 -SJ 00942; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 7231 (Passed) -SJ 00942

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00320Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=7231&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb723100.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb723101e1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB72310426100987.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB72310426100988.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB72310428100020.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB72310428100021.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB72310430100009.html

Bill Comments

feedback