FL H7217 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises legislative intent relating to state's energy policy; provides legislative intent relating to renewable energy production of electricity; deletes provisions for renewable portfolio standard & renewable energy credits; provides mechanism for providers to recover costs to produce or purchase renewable energy under certain conditions; exempts renewable energy projects for which cost recovery is provided under mechanism from requirements for determination of need, etc.
Title
Energy Incentives and Initiatives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-07 | Referred to State Affairs Committee -HJ 588 | |
2011-04-04 | Introduced -HJ 402 | |
2011-04-03 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 648 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1089 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9607 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 6015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 807 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 808 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 809 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 508 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
526 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 954 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/7217 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/7217/BillText/Filed/HTML |