FL H7205 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1965
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1965
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates State Economic Enhancement & Development Trust Fund within Department of Economic Opportunity; provides for purpose of trust fund & sources of funds; provides for annual carryforward of funds; provides for future review & termination or re-creation of trust fund.
Title
State Economic Enhancement and Development TF
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#55 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#134 (Y: 81 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#134 (Y: 81 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1965 | |
2011-05-06 | In returning messages | |
2011-05-06 | Conference Committee Report considered -HJ 1254 | |
2011-04-26 | ||
2011-04-26 | Conference Committee appointed: Representative Aubuchon -HJ 778 | |
2011-04-07 | In returning messages | |
2011-04-07 | In Messages | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time -HJ 460 | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time -HJ 431 | |
2011-04-01 | Filed |