FL H7203 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00012; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
Pending: House Rules & Calendar Council Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes specified community development districts to levy tax on rental or license fee for use of real property; requires approval by district board of supervisors & district landowners; provides procedure to enact tax; provides for effective date of tax; provides for expiration of tax under specified circumstances; specifies uses of tax proceeds; requires prior approval by district board for expenditures of tax proceeds, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Development Districts [WPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0032 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0957 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-19 Veto Message received -HJ 00012; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
2010-06-01 Vetoed by Governor
2010-05-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-30 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01696
2010-04-30 Read 3rd time -SJ 01187; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1 -SJ 01187
2010-04-29 Withdrawn from Finance and Tax -SJ 01004; Substituted for CS/SB 1866 -SJ 01004; Read 2nd time -SJ 01004
2010-04-28 Received -SJ 00986; Referred to Finance and Tax -SJ 00987
2010-04-26 In Messages
2010-04-26 Read 3rd time -HJ 01057; CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 1 -HJ 01057
2010-04-23 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00941
2010-04-20 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00790
2010-04-19 CS read 1st time on 04/19/10 -HJ 00760; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20
2010-04-16 CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00763
2010-04-15 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/16/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-30 Referred to Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00425
2010-03-29 Filed; Introduced -HJ 00412

Same As/Similar To

S1866 (Similar To) 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01004; Substituted CS/HB 7203 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 01004; Laid on Table -SJ 01004

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
02120315Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback