FL H7133 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provision which provides that any person summoned by sheriff or deputy sheriff who fails or refuses to assist in maintaining peace at polls is guilty of first-degree misdemeanor.
Title
Failure to Assist Officers at Polls
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#254 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-21 | In Messages | |
2011-04-20 | Read 2nd time -HJ 714 | |
2011-04-18 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/20/11 | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -HJ 591 | |
2011-04-05 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/07/11, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-28 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/30/11, 8:00 am, 404 HOB --Not Considered | |
2011-03-24 | Referred to Judiciary Committee -HJ 311 | |
2011-03-23 | Introduced -HJ 277 | |
2011-03-22 | Filed |