FL H7123 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that all of the proceeds from filing fees for trial and appellate proceedings be deposited into the State Courts Revenue Trust Fund; providing a tangible personal property assessment limitation, during a certain timeframe and in certain counties, for certain agricultural equipment rendered unable to be used due to Hurricane Michael; reducing tax rates on rental or licensee fees for the use of real property; revising an insurer's authority to reduce certain tax installment payments for purposes of determining if a certain tax penalty is imposed, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#39 (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#383 (Y: 81 N: 25 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#263 (Y: 69 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#262 (Y: 45 N: 64 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Chapter No. 2019-42
2019-05-15 Approved by Governor
2019-05-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-03SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 23 NAYS 17
2019-05-03SenateReceded from 1 amendment(s) (203950)
2019-05-03SenateConcurred in House amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) (743867)
2019-05-03SenateIn returning messages
2019-05-03HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 81 NAYS 25
2019-05-03HouseRefused to concur, requested Senate to recede
2019-05-03HouseRefused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (203950)
2019-05-03HouseConcurred in Senate amendment(s) as amended (749698) 1300
2019-05-03HouseAmendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (636739, 743867)
2019-05-03HouseIn returning messages
2019-05-03SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 2 927
2019-05-03SenateAmendment(s) reconsidered, adopted as amended (749698)
2019-05-03SenateMotion to reconsider adopted
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-02SenateAmendment(s) adopted (749698)
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1412
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-04-26SenateReceived
2019-04-26SenateReferred to Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-04-26SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 69 NAYS 44
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-25HouseAmendment(s) adopted (048697) 915
2019-04-25HouseAmendment(s) failed (100493, 516239, 516297, 904523) 916
2019-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-17HouseCS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
2019-04-17HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-16HouseCS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 9
2019-04-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/16/19, 10:00 am, Webster Hall
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2019-04-11HouseIntroduced
2019-04-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1295 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax
H1377 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
S576 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7127
S1112 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S1412 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7123
H23 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-137

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002395Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1934517Amended CodeSee Bill Text
195096Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196197Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
218131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220197Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
337401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62451055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74101Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/Amendment/555371/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/Amendment/079495/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/Amendment/286319/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/Amendment/516297/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/Amendment/048697/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/Amendment/904523/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/Amendment/432817/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/Amendment/305697/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/Amendment/100493/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/Amendment/516239/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/Vote/HouseVote_h07123c1262.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/Vote/HouseVote_h07123c1263.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/Vote/SenateVote_h07123e1031.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/Vote/HouseVote_h07123e1383.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/Vote/SenateVote_h07123e1039.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7123/Vote/SenateVote_h07123e1030.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback