FL H7123 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-07 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-42; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7079 (Ch. 2010-115)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Saves from scheduled repeal under Open Government Sunset Review Act exemptions from public records requirements for identifying information of participants in Address Confidentiality Program for Victims of Domestic Violence held by Office of Attorney General & contained in voter registration & voting records held by supervisor of elections & Department of State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Address Confidentiality/Domestic Violence [SPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0005 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House Roll Call No. 0802 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-07 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-42; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7079 (Ch. 2010-115)
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-22 Ordered enrolled -HJ 00919
2010-04-21 Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00662; Substituted for SB 882 -SJ 00662; Read 2nd time -SJ 00662; Read 3rd time -SJ 00662; Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 -SJ 00662
2010-04-20 Received -SJ 00657
2010-04-19 In Messages; Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00657
2010-04-19 Read 3rd time -HJ 00740; Passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 00740
2010-04-15 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00692
2010-03-16 Referred to Calendar -HJ 00301
2010-03-15 Filed; Introduced -HJ 00276

Same As/Similar To

H7079 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-115; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7123 (Ch. 2010-42)
S2188 (Similar To) 2010-04-26 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00837; Amendment(s) adopted (903594) -SJ 00837; Substituted HB 7079 -SJ 00837; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7079 (Ch. 2010-115), HB 7123 (Ch. 2010-42) -SJ 00837
S0882 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00662; Substituted HB 7123 -SJ 00662; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7123 (Ch. 2010-42), HB 7079 (Ch. 2010-115) -SJ 00662

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00970585Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0741465Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback