FL H7121 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Chapter No. 2010-137
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Chapter No. 2010-137
Summary
Saves from scheduled repeal under Open Government Sunset Review Act exemption from public records requirements for specified reports of hurricane loss data & associated exposure data that are specific to particular insurance company; requires specified FIU center to publish annual report summarizing loss data & associated exposure data collected from residential property insurers & licensed rating & advisory organizations, etc.
Title
OGSR/Hurricane Loss and Exposure Data [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Chapter No. 2010-137 | |
2010-05-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 01288 | |
2010-04-29 | Read 3rd time -SJ 01085; Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 -SJ 01085 | |
2010-04-28 | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00983; Substituted for SB 1664 -SJ 00983; Read 2nd time -SJ 00983 | |
2010-04-26 | Received -SJ 00873; Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00873 | |
2010-04-19 | In Messages | |
2010-04-19 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00739; Passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 00739 | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00692 | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 00301 | |
2010-03-15 | Filed; Introduced -HJ 00276 |
Same As/Similar To
S1664 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00983; Substituted HB 7121 -SJ 00983; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7121 (Ch. 2010-137) -SJ 00983
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=7121&Chamber=House&Year=2010 |