FL H7119 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-15 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires recording of closed meeting of Florida Commission on Hurricane Loss Projection Methodology or of rate proceeding on insurer's rate filing at which confidential & exempt trade secrets are discussed; creates public records exemption for recording of closed meeting; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Hurricane Loss Projection Methodology [CPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0008 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House Roll Call No. 0800 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-15 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-89
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-23 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01033
2010-04-22 Read 3rd time -SJ 00724; Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 1 -SJ 00724
2010-04-21 Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00669; Substituted for CS/SB 1658 -SJ 00669; Read 2nd time -SJ 00669
2010-04-20 Received -SJ 00657
2010-04-19 In Messages; Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00657
2010-04-19 Read 3rd time -HJ 00739; Passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 00739
2010-04-15 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00692
2010-03-16 Referred to Calendar -HJ 00301
2010-03-15 Filed; Introduced -HJ 00275

Same As/Similar To

S1658 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00669; Substituted HB 7119 -SJ 00669; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7119 (Ch. 2010-89) -SJ 00669

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
06270628Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback