FL H7117 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2014-23), HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2014-23), HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises basis for calculation of school grades & school improvement ratings; revises provisions relating to school improvement & education accountability system, local assessments, & personnel evaluation; provides for transition to new statewide, standardized assessments; authorizes certain bonus rewards to school districts.
Title
School Accountability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2014-23), HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39) |
2014-04-29 | House | Substituted CS/SB 1642 |
2014-04-28 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/14 |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-25 | House | CS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-25 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-24 | House | CS by- Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2 |
2014-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/24/14, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2014-03-20 | House | Referred to Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0895 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39), CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2014-23)
H7031 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-39, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2014-184), CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2014-23)
S1226 (Similar To) 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39), CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2014-23)
S1446 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39), CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2014-23)
S1512 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2014-184), CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2014-23)
S1642 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-23, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39)
H7031 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-39, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2014-184), CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2014-23)
S1226 (Similar To) 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39), CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2014-23)
S1446 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39), CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2014-23)
S1512 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2014-184), CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2014-23)
S1642 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-23, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 621 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 3415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |