FL H7115 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemption from public records requirements for identifying information of applicant for president or provost of state university or Florida College System institution, for public meeting requirements for any portion of meeting held for specified purposes, & for certain recordings of closed portions of meetings; provides certain meetings & information are subject to certain requirements; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec. and Meetings/Postsecondary Education Executive Search

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied on Calendar
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-16HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 3
2019-04-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/16/19, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall
2019-04-08HouseReferred to Education Committee
2019-04-05HouseIntroduced
2019-04-05HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1004098Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback