FL H7115 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DFS to maintain list of certain providers on its website; specifies information to be included in capital recovery report & provides procedures for timely reporting; creates process for determining denial rates; requires DFS to contract with approved provider to calculate denial rates for certain hospital districts; requires DFS to maintain list of approved providers; requires hospital districts to meet specified requirements before levying or receiving increased tax revenues; provides that this section supersedes special acts; provides DFS with emergency rulemaking authority; provides appropriation.
Title
Capital Recovery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-10 | House | CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2015-04-09 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-04-07 | House | CS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 10 |
2015-04-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/07/15, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2015-03-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7117 (Related) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
155 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
189 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |