FL H7099 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 7018 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 7018 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies permit application timeframes required for installation, location, or relocation of utilities within rights-of-way; requires DOT, in coordination with Office of Energy within DACS & Florida Clean Cities Coalitions, or other appropriate entities, to develop & adopt master plan for electric vehicle charging stations on state highway system; specifies goals & objectives of master plan; requires master plan to be updated annually; provides declaration of important state interest.
Title
Essential State Infrastructure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 7018 passed |
2020-03-06 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | Favorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 5 |
2020-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | Introduced |
2020-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H203 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 410 passed
H943 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
H6081 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
S452 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H1239 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
S7018 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-21
S410 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Vetoed by Governor
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H943 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
H6081 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
S452 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H1239 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
S7018 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-21
S410 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Vetoed by Governor
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
337 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 287 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
704 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7099 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7099/BillText/Filed/PDF |