FL H7097 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Removes scheduled repeal of exemption from public record requirements for certain proprietary information provided by insurers to Citizens Property Insurance Corporation policyholder eligibility clearinghouse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#764 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27 Chapter No. 2018-121
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-21 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-08SenatePassed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted for SB 7012
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-07SenateWithdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-03-06SenateReceived
2018-03-06SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HousePassed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HouseIntroduced
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7012 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7097

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6273518Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback