FL H7095 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-184
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adopts Internal Revenue Code in effect on specified date; provides for retroactive effect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption of the Internal Revenue Code for Purposes of the Corporate Income Tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#573 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-21 Chapter No. 2020-184
2020-09-18 Approved by Governor
2020-09-04 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-11HouseOrdered enrolled
2020-03-11SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 672
2020-03-11SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted for SB 7058
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-10SenateWithdrawn from Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2020-03-06SenateReceived
2020-03-06SenateReferred to Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2020-03-06SenateIn Messages
2020-03-06HousePassed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2020-03-06HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-05HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-02-20HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-02-19HouseIntroduced
2020-02-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7058 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7095

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22003Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback