FL H7095 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Removes scheduled repeal of exemption from public records requirements for proprietary confidential business information held by local government electric utility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Local Government Electric Utility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#763 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27 Chapter No. 2018-120
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-21 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-08SenatePassed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0
2018-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 7008
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-07SenateWithdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-03-06SenateReceived
2018-03-06SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HousePassed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HouseIntroduced
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7008 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7095

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1190713Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback