FL H7095 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises list of court-related functions that clerks may fund from filing fees, service charges, costs, & fines; requires clerk & Florida Clerks of Court Operations Corporation to forward quarterly estimates on certain jury-related costs to JAC; revises procedures governing payment of certain costs; authorizes JAC to apportion funds for specified jury-related costs in certain circumstances; provides for issuance to jurors & counties of certificates for amount of compensation still due in certain circumstances; authorizes clerk to make requests to JAC for additional funds to pay specified costs in event of deficiency.
Title
Juror Costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#703 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2016-03-03 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-03-03 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/16 |
2016-02-12 | House | CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-11 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-10 | House | CS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/09/16, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2016-02-01 | House | Introduced |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-29 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |