FL H7093 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Removes scheduled repeal under Open Government Sunset Review Act of exemptions from public records & public meetings requirements for Domestic Security Oversight Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Domestic Security Oversight Council [GPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0003 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House Roll Call No. 0795 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-74
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-22 Ordered enrolled -HJ 00919
2010-04-21 Withdrawn from Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00662; Substituted for SB 618 -SJ 00662; Read 2nd time -SJ 00662; Read 3rd time -SJ 00662; Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 -SJ 00662
2010-04-20 Received -SJ 00657
2010-04-19 In Messages; Referred to Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00657
2010-04-19 Read 3rd time -HJ 00737; Passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 00737
2010-04-15 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00691
2010-03-08 Referred to Calendar -HJ 00225
2010-03-05 Filed; Introduced -HJ 00219

Same As/Similar To

S0618 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00662; Substituted HB 7093 -SJ 00662; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7093 (Ch. 2010-74) -SJ 00662

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
09430314Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback