FL H7087 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Terminates Public Defenders Revenue Trust Fund within Justice Administrative Commission; provides for disposition of balances in & revenues of trust fund; provides procedures for the termination of trust fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trust Funds/Termination/Public Defenders Revenue Trust Fund/JAC

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#53 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Rules
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HousePassed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-27HouseFavorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2019-03-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/27/19, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-20HouseIntroduced
2019-03-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H5003 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2502

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2761Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817568Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback