FL H7081 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7083 (Ch. 2013-216)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7083 (Ch. 2013-216)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Section 2 of Article V & creation of new section in Article XII of State Constitution to require procedures for postconviction or collateral review of capital cases resulting in sentence of death to be governed exclusively by, & to extent provided by, general law.
Title
Postconviction Capital Case Procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7083 (Ch. 2013-216) |
2013-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/04/13, 8:00 am, 404 HOB --Temporarily deferred |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7083 (Related) 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-216
S1740 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7083 (Ch. 2013-216)
S1750 (Similar To) 2013-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7083 (Ch. 2013-216)
S1740 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7083 (Ch. 2013-216)
S1750 (Similar To) 2013-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7083 (Ch. 2013-216)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/7081 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/7081/BillText/Filed/PDF |