FL H7079 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates exemption from public record requirements for certain information of people using public shelters during emergencies & for certain identifying information related to damage assessments held by agencies following disaster; provides for exemption expiration, future legislative review, & repeal; provides public necessity statement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Disaster Response

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#678 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-05SenateReceived
2018-03-05SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-03-01SenateIn Messages
2018-03-01HousePassed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2018-03-01HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-28HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-22HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-02-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/22/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Government Accountability Committee
2018-02-12HouseIntroduced
2018-02-12HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
252385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25264Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback