FL H7069 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Removes requirement of county & municipality to annually report specified fiscal & economic information to EDR; requires DFS to establish certain website; specifies information to be included on department's website; requires DFS to annually generate & distribute to residents specified local government report; authorizes DFS to select contractors for certain purposes.
Title
Local Government Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#539 (Y: 83 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-04 | House | CS passed; YEAS 83 NAYS 34 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-27 | House | CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-26 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-25 | House | CS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 10 |
2020-02-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/25/20, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1512 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
H1339 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-27
H1339 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-27
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
129 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 323 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |