FL H7065 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises Legislative Auditing Committee duties; specifies purpose of local government fiscal transparency requirements; requires local governments to post certain voting record information on websites; requires property appraisers & local governments to post certain property tax information & history on websites; requires public notices for public hearings & meetings prior to certain increases of local government tax levies; specifies noticing & advertising requirements; requires local governments to conduct debt affordability analyses under specified conditions; provides method for local governments that do not operate website to post certain required information.
Title
Local Government Fiscal Transparency
Sponsors
House Government Accountability Committee | House Ways and Means Committee | Sen. Colleen Burton [R] | Rep. Larry Metz [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#237 (Y: 98 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Rules |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-26 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 98 NAYS 15 |
2017-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (115257) |
2017-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-20 | House | CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17 |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-20 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-19 | House | CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 8 |
2017-04-17 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/19/17, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to Government Accountability Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 795 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 84 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 88 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 89 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |