FL H7061 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to State Constitution to require CFO, as prescribed by general law, to annually provide information about counties & municipalities to residents to allow them to compare economic & noneconomic factors of each local government.
Title
Duties of the Chief Financial Officer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#540 (Y: 90 N: 23 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed; YEAS 90 NAYS 23 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 10 |
2020-02-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/25/20, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1502 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules