FL H7057 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-113
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Includes certain detention centers & correctional facilities in provisions restricting operation of unmanned aircraft; authorizes employment of persons 18 years of age as full-time, part-time, or auxiliary correctional officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corrections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#55 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18 Chapter No. 2019-113
2019-06-18 Approved by Governor
2019-06-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-26HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-26SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-26SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 7046
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-26SenateWithdrawn from Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-04-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-01HouseCS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2019-03-29HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-28HouseCS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/28/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-21HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-03-19HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7046 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7057 (Ch. 2019-113)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943133Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943139Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9431395Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94317Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943253Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944714Amended CodeSee Bill Text
945035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
951063Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985644Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback