FL H7053 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Placed on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Renames certain fees & assessments as taxes; renames certain surcharges as surtaxes; renames certain fees as surtaxes; requires municipalities, counties, & special districts to rename certain levies & assessments as specified taxes; repeals obsolete provision; provides appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation Transparency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-05HouseCS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2019-04-05HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-04HouseCS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 6
2019-04-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/04/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-22HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-21HouseCS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
2019-03-21HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-18HouseCS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 9
2019-03-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/18/19, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100348Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
166021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
189011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1973635Amended CodeSee Bill Text
200069Amended CodeSee Bill Text
207004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
210011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2101801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
210276Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2120601Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2120606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
213053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21324Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282709Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162124Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316545Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316550Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3170004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3170006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3170007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3170008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3170010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3170011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3170014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3170016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31923Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31924Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31925Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31927Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31928Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31929Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31930Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31932Amended CodeSee Bill Text
319323Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200655Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200657Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200659Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200804Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008068Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200807Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200846Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200848Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320086Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320089Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200891Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3201325Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32039Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320781Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32214Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32217Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32218Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32229Amended CodeSee Bill Text
376307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
398298Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3957015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3957016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403718Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4037185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40807Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4270159Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050714Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050902Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050904Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050908Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050909Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6070122Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6070124Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6070125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6070128Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6070501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6070502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6071420Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6071422Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6071502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60715315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
607193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60902Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60908Amended CodeSee Bill Text
610104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61701201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6170122Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6170124Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6170128Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6170501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6170502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6171420Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6171422Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6171533Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6171623Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6171807Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6172006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6172102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201810Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201904Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201906Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201909Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62081054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62081055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6209003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
65823Amended CodeSee Bill Text
72011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback