FL H7047 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Removes scheduled repeal of exemption from public record requirements for certain information received by Department of Legal Affairs relating to security breaches.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Security Breach Information

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#87 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Chapter No. 2019-32
2019-05-14 Approved by Governor
2019-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-01HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-01SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-30SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-30SenateSubstituted for SB 7008
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-30SenateWithdrawn from Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HousePassed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-28HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-26HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-25HouseFavorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/25/19, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7008 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7047

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
501171Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback