FL H7041 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Deletes provisions that have expired, have become obsolete, have had their effect, have served their purpose, or have been impliedly repealed or superseded; replaces incorrect cross-references & citations; corrects grammatical, typographical, & like errors; removes inconsistencies, redundancies, & unnecessary repetition in statutes; & improves clarity of statutes & facilitates their correct interpretation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Statutes/General

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseLaid on Table, refer to SB 4
2019-03-20HouseSubstituted SB 4
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/20/19
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S4 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Chapter No. 2019-3

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002395Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004097Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10046495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100506Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1006061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100612Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100724Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1007273Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100831Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100989Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101169Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10122315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012584Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101362Amended CodeSee Bill Text
105036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
154067Amended CodeSee Bill Text
159834Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633164Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633177Amended CodeSee Bill Text
17076Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1934615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1961975Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
218135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
218401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24320Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25077Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2734Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2754Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889623Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32876Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
364163Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3735905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3800651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3810072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381984Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3833362Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
388021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390139Amended CodeSee Bill Text
392015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
393031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
393035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
393068Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395086Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
391026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
393063Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3954025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976760Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400471Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4004785Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402310Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403861Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408820Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4099083Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4552286Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458348Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468432Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5270201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
560109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57808Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57811Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57813Amended CodeSee Bill Text
59002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62740951Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627746Amended CodeSee Bill Text
634436Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6413107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
641511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655825Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7360403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
825101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8930551Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
934255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430585Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9431758Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98548Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback