FL H7037 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7034 (Ch. 2019-16)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7034 (Ch. 2019-16)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes scheduled repeal of exemption from public records requirements for certain images & data obtained through use of automated license plate recognition system & personal identifying information of individual in data generated from such images.
Title
OGSR/Automated License Plate Recognition Systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7034 (Ch. 2019-16) |
2019-04-10 | House | Substituted SB 7034 |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19 |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-03-21 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/21/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-12 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7034 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Chapter No. 2019-16
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7037 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7037/BillText/Filed/PDF |