FL H7037 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the governing body of a municipality to determine the dates on which an initial and runoff election for municipal office are held and providing options therefor; requiring counties that have established certain dates for the election of municipal officers through a special act to conduct municipal elections on specified dates; requiring municipal recall elections to be held concurrently with municipal elections under certain conditions, etc.
Title
Election Dates for Municipal Office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#593 (Y: 70 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (281426, 976690) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1262 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules |
2018-02-20 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 70 NAYS 45 |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-14 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (105739) 569 |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18 |
2018-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-24 | House | Favorable by- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 01/24/18, 11:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Public Integrity and Ethics Committee |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1262 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7037
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
100 | 3605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
100 | 361 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |