FL H7037 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendment to s. 12, Art. V of State Constitution to provide that all records, materials, & proceedings related to complaints & investigations of Judicial Qualifications Commission not otherwise exempt from disclosure are public upon filing of formal charges against judge or upon determination by commission or investigative panel that formal charges will not be filed; removes outdated provisions.
Title
Judicial Qualifications Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-05 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/07/11, 8:00 am, 404 HOB --Not Considered | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Judiciary Committee -HJ 223 | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/7037 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/7037/BillText/Filed/HTML |