FL H7035 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Chapter No. 2016-28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Chapter No. 2016-28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes scheduled repeal of public records exemption for confidential or exempt information received from certain state or federal agencies & information received or developed by OFR in joint or multiagency examination or investigation.
Title
OGSR/Office of Financial Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#492 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#492 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | Chapter No. 2016-28 | |
2016-03-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-01 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-02-10 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Substituted for SB 7032 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Received |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2016-01-27 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-01-27 | House | Immediately certified |
2016-01-27 | House | Passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-01-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-01-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/26/16 |
2016-01-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-13 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 01/13/16, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-12-18 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2015-12-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7032 (Same As) 2016-01-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7035 (Ch. 2016-28)