FL H7033 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-155
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-155
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Task Force on Closing the Achievement Gap for Boys; provides task force purpose, membership, meetings, & future expiration; requires DOE to provide support & data & information to assist the task force; requires task force submit report; provides for future expiration of task force.
Title
Task Force on Closing the Achievement Gap for Boys
Sponsors
House Early Learning and Elementary Education Subcommittee | Rep. Traci Koster [R] | Rep. Alex Andrade [R] | Rep. Linda Chaney [R] |
Rep. Sam Garrison [R] | Rep. Dana Trabulsy [R] | Rep. Susan Valdes [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#56 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#194 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#194 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Chapter No. 2021-155 | |
2021-06-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-15 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-26 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted for SB 1816 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-21 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021) |
2021-04-15 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2021-03-16 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1816 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7033 (Ch. 2021-155)