FL H7033 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to establish Medicaid block grants.
Title
Medicaid Block Grants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 75 N: 39 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Received |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations; Rules |
2017-03-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-03-09 | House | Adopted; YEAS 75 NAYS 39 |
2017-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/17 |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed |