FL H7033 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements for appointment of members of judicial nominating commissions; provides that, with exception of members selected from list of nominees provided by Board of Governors of The Florida Bar, current member of judicial nominating commission (JNC) appointed by Governor serves at pleasure of Governor; provides for each expired term or vacancy to be filled by appointment in same manner as member whose position is being filled; deletes obsolete provisions; deletes requirement that Executive Office of Governor establish uniform rules of procedure consistent with State Constitution when suspending for cause member of JNC; provides that JNC for 1st DCA will nominate persons to Office of Judges of Compensation Claims; deletes provisions creating nominating commission solely for Office of Judges of Compensation Claims.
Title
Judiciary
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-27 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 291 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/7033 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/7033/BillText/Filed/PDF |