FL H7033 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Deletes provisions establishing Minority Business Certification Task Force, requiring that criteria for certification of minority business enterprises be approved by task force, & authorizing task force to amend statewide & interlocal agreement for certification of minority business enterprises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certification of Minority Business Enterprises

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#78 (Y: 100 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-25 In Messages
2011-03-24 Read 2nd time -HJ 298
2011-03-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/24/11
2011-03-17 Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 260
2011-03-15 On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/17/11, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2011-03-14 Referred to State Affairs Committee -HJ 223
2011-03-10 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2870943Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback