FL H7033 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Chapter No. 2010-1; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Chapter No. 2010-1; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90)
Summary
Establishes temporary state extended benefits for weeks of unemployment; provides for state extended benefits for certain weeks & for periods of high unemployment; reduces amount of exempt wages beginning January 1, 2010; increases amount of exempt wages beginning January 1, 2012; suspends exempt wages adjustment when repayment of federal advance is owed, etc. APPROPRIATION: $1,547,504.
Title
Unemployment Compensation [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Chapter No. 2010-1; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90) | |
2010-03-02 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 00172; Approved by Governor -HJ 00172 | |
2010-03-02 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 00172 | |
2010-03-02 | In Messages; Received -SJ 00176; Referred to Commerce; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00176; Withdrawn from Commerce; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00005; Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1666 -SJ 00006; Read 2nd time -SJ 00006; Read 3rd time -SJ 00006; CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 00006; Immediately certified -SJ 00006 | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Finance & Tax Council -HJ 00149; On Council agenda-- Finance & Tax Council, 02/17/10, 1:30 pm, 404-H; CS by- Finance & Tax Council; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 00171; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00164; Introduced -HJ 00009; Read 2nd time -HJ 00009; Read 3rd time -HJ 00009; CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 -HJ 00009; Immediately certified -HJ 00009 | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-22 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-02-17 | CS by- Finance & Tax Council; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Finance & Tax Council; On Council agenda-- Finance & Tax Council, 02/17/10, 1:30 pm, 404-H | |
2010-02-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1666 (Similar To) 2010-03-02 - Introduced, referred to Commerce; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00115; On Committee agenda-- Commerce, 02/16/10, 1:30 pm, 401-S; CS by Commerce; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00164; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -SJ 00159; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00164; On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 02/17/10, 1:00 pm, 412-K; CS/CS by- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -SJ 00164; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -SJ 00159; Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00165; Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00005; Substituted CS/HB 7033 -SJ 00006; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7033 (Ch. 2010-1), CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90) -SJ 00006
H5003 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Line Item Veto Message received -HJ 00016; Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
S1736 (Similar To) 2010-05-17 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-90; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7033 (Ch. 2010-1), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138)
H5003 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Line Item Veto Message received -HJ 00016; Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
S1736 (Similar To) 2010-05-17 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-90; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7033 (Ch. 2010-1), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0443 | 1117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0443 | 1217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0443 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0443 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=7033&Chamber=House&Year=2010 |