FL H7031 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Conforms Florida Statutes to directive of Legislature in s. 9, ch. 2012-116, LOF, codified as s. 11.242(5)(j), F.S., to prepare reviser's bill to omit all statutes & laws, or parts thereof, which grant duplicative, redundant, or unused rulemaking authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Statutes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseLaid on Table, refer to SB 312
2021-04-13HouseSubstituted SB 312
2021-04-08HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021)
2021-03-16HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-03-16HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-03-12House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S312 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - Chapter No. 2021-53

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
335066Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33981Amended CodeSee Bill Text
380276Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback