FL H7031 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Removes scheduled repeal of public meetings exemption for certain portions of meetings by duly constituted criminal justice commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Criminal Justice Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#567 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21 Chapter No. 2018-40
2018-03-19 Approved by Governor
2018-03-09 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-02-27HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-02-27SenatePassed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-02-27SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-21SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-21SenateSubstituted for SB 7002
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-21SenateWithdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-02-08SenateReceived
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-02-07SenateIn Messages
2018-01-31HousePassed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2018-01-31HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-31HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-25HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18
2018-01-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-18HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 01/18/18, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-11HouseIntroduced
2018-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7002 (Same As) 2018-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7031

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28601141Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback