FL H7031 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises exceptions to marketability by including homeowners' association & mandatory property owners' association covenants & restrictions; authorizes mandatory property owners' association to file notice to preserve covenant or restriction; provides exceptions; authorizes certain homeowners' associations & mandatory property owners' associations to revive certain covenants & restrictions that have lapsed.
Title
Marketable Record Titles to Real Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died on Calendar |
2016-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-22 | House | CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-21 | House | CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/21/16, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2015-12-03 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
712 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
712 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
712 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
712 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |