FL H7029 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals and amends provisions that have become inoperative by noncurrent repeal or expiration & may be omitted from 2021 Florida Statutes only through reviser's bill duly enacted by Legislature.
Title
Florida Statutes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Laid on Table, refer to SB 310 |
2021-04-13 | House | Substituted SB 310 |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021) |
2021-03-16 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-12 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S310 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - Chapter No. 2021-52
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 3105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 394 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4282 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 5716 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
119 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
216 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
267 | 0618 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 2818 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 986 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 00673 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |