FL H7023 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-40, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-40, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemptions from public records requirements for secure login credentials held by Commission on Ethics & certain information entered into electronic filing system for financial disclosure forms; specifies conditions under which such information is no longer exempt; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Financial Disclosure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#125 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#125 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Chapter No. 2019-40, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97) | |
2019-05-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-05-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-04-24 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2019-04-24 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 7042 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-17 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-08 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-04 | House | CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/04/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-13 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7021 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-97, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2019-40), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
S7042 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2019-40), CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97)
S7040 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97), CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2019-40)
S7042 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2019-40), CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97)
S7040 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97), CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2019-40)