FL H7023 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes provisions that have expired, have become obsolete, have had their effect, have served their purpose, or have been impliedly repealed or superseded; replaces incorrect cross-references & citations; corrects grammatical, typographical, & like errors; removes inconsistencies, redundancies, & unnecessary repetition in statutes; & improves clarity of statutes & facilitates their correct interpretation.
Title
Florida Statutes/General
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#590 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#590 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Chapter No. 2018-110 | |
2018-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-05 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 33 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1342 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2018-02-20 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-14 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (316273) |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1342 (Same As) 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7023
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4282 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 491 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 621 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 4473 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 735 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
119 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
119 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 20195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
197 | 3632 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
197 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
199 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 8745 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 755 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 442 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 444 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 4725 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 357 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 358 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
258 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
261 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
261 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
284 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
286 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 0001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1258 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
315 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 833 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 865 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
331 | 3051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
332 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
344 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
364 | 386 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 470 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 2495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 986 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 987 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 3035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 6045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 064 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 0611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 811 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 9091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1754 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 906 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 913 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 219 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
487 | 2071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 529 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
490 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 282 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 468 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 552 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 553 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 01211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 049 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
520 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
554 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 285 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 748 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
663 | 532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 0306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
876 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
905 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |